+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2522.).
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1987.).
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 977.)
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7).
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 20, 2015: AB 673 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
July 16, 2015: Special Consent #5 AB673 Santiago
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 23, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 16, 2015: AB 673 SANTIAGO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2015: AB 673 SANTIAGO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor