+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Wood.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
March 23, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor