+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 472, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3500.).
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 13).
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 3242.)
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2503.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1488.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 15, 2017: AB 669 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 13, 2017: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
September 6, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB669 Berman By Hernandez
- Yeas: 40
September 1, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
May 11, 2017: AB 669 BERMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 3, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor