+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1870.).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 1078.)
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 3).
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB669 Holden By Jackson
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 8, 2019: AB 669 Holden Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
April 3, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
March 26, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor