+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2907.).
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1488.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 14, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # AB667
- Yeas: 40
September 1, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 14, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 11, 2017: AB 667 REYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 3, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor