+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
On September 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.).
On June 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 20).
On June 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 9.)
On March 29, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 28, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 28).
- Coauthors revised.
On February 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
September 7, 2023: AB 665 Wendy Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 4
September 6, 2023: Assembly 3rd Reading AB665 Wendy Carrillo et al
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2023: AB 665 Wendy Carrillo Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 16
March 28, 2023: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor