+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2567.).
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1224.)
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 8, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB665 Frazier By Berryhill
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
June 23, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
June 23, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2015: AB 665 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2015: AB 665 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
April 14, 2015: Amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor