+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On September 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On April 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and APPR.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1617.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On March 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 17, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 11, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
May 13, 2019: AB 664 Cooper Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor