+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 2035.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 8, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 28, 2019: AB 663 Cunningham Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
March 26, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor