+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 38, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1490.).
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8).
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1446.)
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 18, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd AB663 Irwin
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 8, 2015: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 14, 2015: AB 663 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2015: AB 663 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor