+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 2999.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2990.)
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2593.).
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 30).
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 1869.)
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 9, 2015: AB 662 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
September 8, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB662 Bonilla By Beall
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
June 3, 2015: AB 662 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 7
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 3
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor