+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3719.)
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23).
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On January 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
January 29, 2014: AB 659 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
January 15, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7