+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 854, Statutes of 2022.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 14.).
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 5129.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 18. Page 3437.)
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20).
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 25, 2022: AB 655 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 13
August 25, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB655 Kalra et al. By Bradford
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
August 11, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2022: AB 655 Kalra Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 10
January 20, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3