+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 366, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2609.).
On August 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2146.).
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1142.)
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 27, 2015: AB 653 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 24, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB653 Levine By Block
- Yeas: 40
June 24, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2015: AB 653 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor