+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- In committee: Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23).
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 12, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
April 23, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor