+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 630, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 24. Page 2911.).
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2404.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 27).
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1807.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 4, 2015: AB 652 COOLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 24
September 2, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB652 Cooley By Pan
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 6, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: AB 652 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 5
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor