+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
April 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor