+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3393.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2743.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On August 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1255.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3).
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2019: AB 65 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 10, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB65 Petrie-Norris et al. By Hill
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
July 3, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 19, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 11, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2019: AB 65 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 3, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor