+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., PUB. S. and RLS.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 2066.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX.
On January 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 12.
On December 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 10, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 1, 2017: AB 64 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
April 18, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2