+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 353, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2905.).
On August 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 28).
On August 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2182.).
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1811.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2019: AB 635 Bigelow Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
August 28, 2019: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
August 15, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB635 Bigelow et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 22, 2019: AB 635 Bigelow Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
March 27, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor