+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 707, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3035.).
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2183.).
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 915.)
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 877.)
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 9, 2013: AB 635 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
September 6, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB635 Ammiano By DeSaulnier
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
June 18, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2013: AB 635 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor