+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2921.).
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2109.).
On August 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 1473.)
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 6, 2013: AB 633 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
September 3, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB633 Salas By Torres
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 19, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2013: AB 633 SALAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
May 7, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
April 24, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor