+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 1334.)
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 28).
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2015: AB 628 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 4
April 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor