+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2021.
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2240.).
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1624.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
August 30, 2021: Consent Calendar AB624
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 27, 2021: AB 624 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 27, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8