+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 2582.).
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1859.).
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 916.)
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 2).
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 19, 2013: AB 624 MITCHELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 9
August 15, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB624 Mitchell By De León
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
April 15, 2013: AB 624 MITCHELL Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 9
April 2, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2