+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 2618.).
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2115.).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 1360.)
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 5).
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 1, 2021: AB 616 Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 8
August 26, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB616 Stone et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 5
June 7, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 10, 2021: AB 616 Stone Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 11
May 5, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor