+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6846.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5775.).
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Newman.
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 28).
On August 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1539.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 10).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2018: AB 613 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 27, 2018: 3
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 27, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB613 Nazarian et al. By Hill
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 28, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
June 12, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 15, 2017: AB 613 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 10, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
April 18, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1