+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1654.).
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1454.)
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On January 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On January 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
On January 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
July 3, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB61 Gatto By DeSaulnier
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2013: AB 61 GATTO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
May 8, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor