+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 725, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 3113.).
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2489.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 18).
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 1503.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 23).
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2019: AB 61 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
September 4, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB61 Ting et al. By Skinner
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 10
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
July 8, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 6, 2019: AB 61 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 9
February 26, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2019: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 8