+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2326.).
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1390.)
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 31, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB609 Santiago By Dodd
- Yeas: 40
June 13, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2017: AB 609 SANTIAGO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor