+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 786, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1979.).
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 12).
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1008.)
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 26, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB607 Perea By Block
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 12, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 26, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2013: AB 607 PEREA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
April 10, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor