+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2391.).
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 1722.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1853.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
On February 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
September 3, 2021: Special Consent AB604
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 15, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 17
June 2, 2021: AB 604 Daly Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 5, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor