+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 491, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3545.).
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 12).
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3439.)
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2749.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1581.)
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 13, 2019: AB 602 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 12, 2019: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
September 10, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB602 Berman et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 40
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2019: AB 602 Berman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 30, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 12
April 30, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
April 4, 2019: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor