+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5738.).
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3757.).
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 1791.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1651.)
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
June 30, 2014: AB 600 BONTA Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2014: Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
June 5, 2014: Special Consent #16 AB600 Bonta By Corbett
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
May 13, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2013: AB 600 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
April 29, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 5