+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
On July 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
On May 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
On April 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 29, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22).
On February 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
August 14, 2023: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 5, 2023: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2023: AB 599 Ward Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 18, 2023: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2023: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor