+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 8. Page 3289.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2707.).
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 1656.)
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 13, 2017: AB 597 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB597 Mark Stone By Hill
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 27, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2017: AB 597 STONE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 10
May 9, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor