+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
January 5, 2016: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 11