+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 611, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3409.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2755.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1589.)
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 11, 2019: AB 593 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 10, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB593 Carrillo By Morrell
- Yeas: 40
June 12, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 9, 2019: AB 593 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
March 20, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor