+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On July 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13).
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Retained in suspense file.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
July 13, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
July 13, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor