+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
On February 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor