+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 3892.)
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 23).
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
- Coauthors revised.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
January 27, 2020: AB 582 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
January 23, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Present/NV: 6
March 19, 2019: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor