+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3425.)
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3364.)
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A. & A.R.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
On February 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
June 27, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2022: AB 581 Irwin Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor