+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 12, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3073.).
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3637.).
On January 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 14).
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB579 Melendez By Nielsen Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
January 21, 2014: AB 579 MELENDEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
January 14, 2014: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
April 16, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
April 16, 2013: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor