+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 2570.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 1779.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8).
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 8, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB578 Low By Leno
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1
July 6, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 2, 2015: AB 578 LOW Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 8, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 8, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor