+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 776, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3017.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2445.).
On August 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10).
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1979.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 19).
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 5, 2019: AB 577 Eggman Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 3, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB577 Eggman et al. By Portantino
- Yeas: 40
July 10, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2019: AB 577 Eggman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 5
March 19, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15