+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3107.).
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2513.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1822.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P., & W.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 11, 2017: AB 574 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 6, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB574 Quirk By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 40
September 1, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 5, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water]
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2017: AB 574 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
April 4, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor