+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk-Silva.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the unfinished business file.
- Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5701.).
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1933.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2018: Special Consent AB572
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: AB 572 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor