+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2695.).
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 13. Page 2116.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
- Coauthors revised.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 9, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB571 Mullin et al. By Allen
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 8
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2019: AB 571 Mullin Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
April 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor