+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On January 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Stricken from file.
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 3369.).
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2768.).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11).
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 1909.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
- Coauthors revised.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 14, 2017: AB 569 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 4
September 12, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB569 Gonzalez Fletcher By Atkins
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 13
September 1, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 28, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: AB 569 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 9
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor