+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 43. Noes 30. Page 2970.).
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 2453.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 30. Page 1786.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8).
On March 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 8, 2015: AB 561 CAMPOS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 7
September 3, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB561 Campos By Mendoza
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 4
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 13, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
July 13, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 2, 2015: AB 561 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 8
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 8, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 8, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor